## Multiplication tricks for easy calculations | Math Tricks

Multiplication of numbers plays very important role in math calculation. In this page explained some **quick multiplication tricks** to save time in* math calculations*. Depend upon the given numbers we chose the different types of *multiplication tricks.*

**Type -1 :** Multiplication tips for 2digit by 2 digit , 3digit by 3 digit and 4digit by 2 digit numbers. please go through the below link

Easy shortcut multiplication tips for 2digit, 3digit and 4digit numbers.

**Type -2 :** The given numbers are near to 10, 100, 1000 ( It can be solved in single step by doing practice. Here for your understanding purpose given in step by step)

**Example -1 : ** 94 x 96 = ?

Step-1: Find the value to roundup the given numbers i.e ( 94 + 6) & (96 + 4). i.e “-6” and “-4” ( Ans: _ _ _ _ )

Step-2: Multiplying the roundup numbers i.e – 6 x – 4 = 24 ( Ans: _ _ 24 )

Step-3: Add the roundup numbers for given numbers i.e (94 – 4 = 90) or ( 96 -6 = 90) ( Ans: 9024 )

See the below diagram for better understanding.

**Example -2 : ** 112 x 107 = ?

Step-1: Find the value to roundup the given numbers i.e ( 112 – 12) & (107 – 7 ). i.e “+12” and “+7” ( Ans: _ _ _ _ _ )

Step-2: Multiplying the roundup numbers i.e 12 x 7=84 ( Ans: _ _ _ 84 )

Step-3: Add the roundup numbers for given numbers i.e (112+7 = 119 ) or ( 107+12 = 119) ( Ans: 11984 )

See the below diagram for better understanding.

**Example -3 : ** 92 x 107 = ?

Step-1: Find the value to roundup the given numbers i.e ( 92 +8) & (107 – 7 ). i.e “-8” and “+7” ( Ans: _ _ _ _ _ )

Step-2: Multiplying the roundup numbers i.e (-8) x (+7) = -56. So add 100 for this i.e -56+100 = 44 ( Ans: _ _ _ 44 )

Step-3: Add the roundup numbers for given numbers i.e (92+7 = 99 ) or (107-9 = 99). A gain subtract 1 from 99 i.e 99-1 = 98 ( Ans: 9844)

See the below diagram for better understanding.

**Example -4 :** 981 x 1012 = ?

Step-1: Find the value to roundup the given numbers i.e ( 981+19) & (1012 – 12 ). i.e “-19” and “+12”

( Ans: _ _ _ _ _ _ )

Step-2: Multiplying the roundup numbers i.e (-19) x (+12 )= – 228. So add 1000 for this i.e -228+1000 = 772

( Ans: _ _ _ 772 )

Step-3: Add the roundup numbers for given numbers i.e (981+12= 993 ) or (1012-19 = 993). A gain subtract 1 from 993 i.e 993-1 = 992

( Ans: 992772)

See the below diagram for better understanding.

The above sum 981 x 1012 = ? can be solved by using simple **algebra formulas.**

=981 x 1012 = 981 x (1000 + 12 )

=981000 + (981 x 12 )

Again 12 write as 10+2

= 981000+[ 981 x (10 + 2) ]

= 981000 + 9810 + 1962 = **992773**

**Type -3 :** Multiplying the numbers by 5, 25 , 125.

**Example -5 :** 125468 x 5 = ?

Here using simple logic i.e replace ** 5 with ( 10 / 2 )**. So add zero for given number and divide with 2.

125468 x 5 = 1254680 / 2 = **627340**

**Example -6 :** 685624 x 25 = ?

Here using simple logic i.e replace ** 25 with ( 100 / 4 ).** So add two zeroes for given number and divide by 4.

685624 x 25 = 68562400 / 4 = **17140600.**

**Example -7 :** 3549 x 125 = ?

Here using simple logic i.e replace ** 125 with ( 1000 / 8 )**. So add three zeroes for given number and divide by 8.

3549 x 125 = 3549000 / 8 =** 443625.**

**Type -4 :** Multiplying the numbers by 11, 22 , 33 …..88

**Example -8 :** 58974 x 11 = ?

Here we can write answer in single step but for your understanding purpose given step by step

Step-1 : From 58974 take lost digit ( i.e 4 )and write in place of lost digit in your answer.

( Ans : _ _ _ _ _4)

Step-2 : From 58974 take lost and second digits and add it ( i.e 7 +4 = 11 ). Now take 1 and 1 carry over to next step.

( Ans : _ _ _ _ 14)

Step-3 : From 58974 take second , third digits and carry over number from lost step and add it ( i.e 9 +7 + 1 = 17 ). Now take 7 and 1 carry over to next step.

( Ans : _ _ _ 714).

Step-4 : From 58974 take fourth , third digits and carry over number from lost step and add it ( i.e 8+ 9 + 1 = 18 ). Now take 8 and 1 carry over to next step.

( Ans : _ _ 87 14).

Step-5 : From 58974 take first , fourth digits and carry over number from lost step and add it ( i.e 5+ 8 + 1 = 14 ). Now take 4 and 1 carry over to next step.

( Ans : _4 87 34).

Step-5 : From 58974 take first digit and carry over number from lost step and add it ( i.e 1+5 = 6 ). Now take 6 into the answer.

( Ans : 64 87 34).

See the diagram for easy understanding.

**Example -9:** 2456 x 77 = ?

Here we can break down the numbers into simpler** multiplication tasks**. Now we apply above techniques.

i.e 2456 x 77 = 2456 x 11 x 7

= 27016 x 7 = 189112.

**Type -5 : **When sum of unit digit having 10 and remaining digits are same in the give problem.

**Example -10 :** 257 x 253 = ?

Here sum of unit digits having 10 ( 7 + 3 = 10). and remaining digits are same in both. Now follow this technique

Step-1 : Multiply the lost digits i.e 7 x 3 = 21 ( Ans : _ _ _ 21)

Step-2 : Multiplying the remaining digits (same digits in both numbers) with preceding number i.e 25 x 26 = 650

Next reversion of this page will be add some more ,__multiplication tricks__.

*Hi friends Thanks for reading. I Hope you liked it. Give feed back, comments and please don’t forget to share it*

**Math Tricks
**

Easy Addition and Subtraction Tricks | Shortcut Process for addition

Percentage formulas while increase and decrease percent of a number

Easiest way to find square of a 2 digit number | Shortcut trick for Square

Shortcut Methods for finding the Cube of a number | number cube tricks

Cube Root formula of Perfect Cubes of 1 to 100 | Cube root formula in math

Short Cut methods to square root calculation with examples

Shortcuts methods of Division math | Tips and tricks for math division

## 2 thoughts on “Multiplication tricks and tips in mathematics | Shortcuts in multiplications”

## devendra

(April 25, 2019 - 6:57 am)amazing post sir.

## sivaalluri

(April 25, 2019 - 8:16 am)Thank you